This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/11/2021 at 03:46:07 (UTC).

LARACUENTE, ELSA vs. CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE INC

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 LARACUENTE, ELSA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1556

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARACUENTE, ELSA

Defendant

CRACKER BARREL OLD COUNTRY STORE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAKALAR, GEORGE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

2/26/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/9/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/9/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

11/6/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/6/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

11/6/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/6/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

11/6/2020: ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/21/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/15/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/15/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/15/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/15/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/15/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/15/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2021
  • DocketAttorney GEORGE MICHAEL BAKALAR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BAKALAR, GEORGE MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/15/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001556

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000073280 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 115011200 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201015235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAKALAR, GEORGE MICHAEL