This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/18/2021 at 13:03:01 (UTC).

LAPIERRE, LYNNE vs. PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 LAPIERRE, LYNNE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1406

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAPIERRE, LYNNE

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVY, HAROLD

ROSENBAUM, DANIEL

Defendant Attorney

MARCKS, CELESTE BARBARA

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - AMENDED ( V )

1/14/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - AMENDED ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

11/23/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

11/23/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

10/19/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/21/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/18/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: MARCKS, CELESTE BARBARA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ROSENBAUM, DANIEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065744; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LEVY, HAROLD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000065744 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113609653 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001406

    Read MoreRead Less