This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/31/2023 at 12:05:19 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC vs. TENORE, ERICA LYNN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against TENORE, ERICA LYNN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0004

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

TENORE, ERICA LYNN

TENORE, JOSEPH WARREN

LAKEWOOD PARK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

STATE OF FLORIDA

ST. LUCIE COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT BOARD

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELUCA, ORLANDO

Defendant Attorney

JONES, HASTINGS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS ISSUED - ERICA LYNN TENORE

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - ERICA LYNN TENORE

SUMMONS ISSUED - JOSEPH W TENORE

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - JOSEPH W TENORE

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

12/31/2022: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

SUMMONS ISSUED - LAKEWOOD PARK PROPERTY

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - LAKEWOOD PARK PROPERTY

SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE OF FLORIDA

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED - SLC CODE ENFORCEMENT

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - SLC CODE ENFORCEMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED - DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE FL

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE FL

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

1/3/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

3/23/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

3/13/2023: ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/13/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/13/2023: ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

3/7/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

3/7/2023: NOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

DEFAULT

2/28/2023: DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

2/28/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/28/2023: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingEvent: NON-JURY TRIAL; Judge: BELANGER, ROBERT E; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/09/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BELANGER, ROBERT E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DELUCA, ORLANDO - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2023CA000004, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC VS. TENORE, ERICA LYNN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/13/2023"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023000020926 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 168575616 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230313235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/31/2022 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less