This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/01/2023 at 05:03:23 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC vs. TENORE, ERICA LYNN

Case Summary

On 12/31/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against TENORE, ERICA LYNN. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0004

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendants

TENORE, ERICA LYNN

TENORE, JOSEPH WARREN

LAKEWOOD PARK PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

STATE OF FLORIDA

ST. LUCIE COUNTY CODE ENFORCEMENT BOARD

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELUCA, ORLANDO

Defendant Attorney

JONES, HASTINGS

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/16/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/16/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

2/15/2023: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

2/6/2023: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/31/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/31/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/31/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/31/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

12/31/2022: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

LIS PENDENS

12/31/2022: LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

12/31/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/31/2022 CASE NUMBER 2023CA000004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less