This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/18/2020 at 08:45:53 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs. BUCK, DONALD

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BUCK, DONALD. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1652

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

BUCK, DONALD

MAGNOLIA LAKES RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

BUCK, DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STORRINGS, JASON A

KASSAHUN, ALEMAYEHU

SEIDEN, JEFFREY MICHAEL

FORCE, STEVEN L

SAEED, AAMIR HAYAT

FULLER, SHANE

PATEL, PRATIK R

GALIPAULT, JOANNE MARY

JORDAN, MIGDALIA

Defendant Attorneys

RUSSO, ADAM GARRETT

ENSOR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

1/27/2020: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

9/27/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

9/27/2019: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

8/21/2019: LIS PENDENS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

8/21/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

ORDER SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT ( V )

11/5/2019: ORDER SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

9/27/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/12/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4311.2362 / 4608719) ( V )

8/22/2019: LIS PENDENS ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4311.2362 / 4608719) ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

8/21/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

8/21/2019: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

8/21/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 01/27/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4342.1628 / 4638244) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING ASIDE ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KASSAHUN, ALEMAYEHU ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/21/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001652

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $1956.00 RECEIPT #2019000069672 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 94521767 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190821235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less