This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 05/20/2020 at 01:52:17 (UTC).

L & M ELITE SERVICES INCORPORATED vs. ALMORE, CHARLOTTE

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 L M ELITE SERVICES INCORPORATED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALMORE, CHARLOTTE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2220

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L & M ELITE SERVICES INCORPORATED

Defendants

ALMORE, CHARLOTTE

BELL, MICHAEL E II

SOLOMON, PATRICIA

LAIDLER, BERTRAND JR

UM KITCHEN CABINETS INC

STUART PAINT & SUPPLY INC

CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT OF ST. LUCIE COUNTY

GROUP ONE CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBBER, GLENN JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

CRICKENBERGER, GLENN A

BIEHL, SHEILA

HARLOWE, SCOTT ROBERT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/28/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

2/5/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE ( V )

1/8/2020: REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE ( V )

DEFAULT ( V )

1/8/2020: DEFAULT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

1/3/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

12/19/2019: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

12/12/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

12/6/2019: ANSWER ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

11/15/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

COUNTER CLAIM - AND CROSSCLAIM - AMENDED

2/27/2020: COUNTER CLAIM - AND CROSSCLAIM - AMENDED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

2/13/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

1/8/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

12/26/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL ( V )

12/18/2019: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

12/17/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE ( V )

12/11/2019: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/9/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/15/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO SPS' COUNTERCLAIM AND CROSSCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000019721; Applied Amount; $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: BIEHL, SHEILA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002220, L & M ELITE SERVICES INCORPORATED VS. ALMORE, CHARLOTTE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/28/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK - COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/15/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002220

    Read MoreRead Less