This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 16:06:25 (UTC).

KARPINSKI, SANDRA W vs. KARPINSKI, DANIEL D

Case Summary

On 12/06/2022 KARPINSKI, SANDRA W filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARPINSKI, DANIEL D. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3010

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KARPINSKI, SANDRA W

Respondent

KARPINSKI, DANIEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) - RECORDED (OTHER.4935.294. / 5139708)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: HEISEY, MICHAEL C; Location: Courtroom 4B - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: HEISEY, MICHAEL C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDRIVERS LICENSE COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2022000092896

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAPPLICATION INDIGENT STATUS - DENIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ASSESSED $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDISSOLUTION JUDGMENT FEE ASSESSED $10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR003010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less