This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 11/01/2020 at 09:48:08 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. HILL, SHERLENE D

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HILL, SHERLENE D. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1353

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1

CRARY BUCHANAN P A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDOUARD SAINT HILAIRE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHERLENE D HILL A/K/A SHERLENE D DAVIS

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #2

SAINT HILAIRE, EDOUARD JEROME

CHARTERED ENTERPRISES LLC

HILL, SHERLENE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREEN, KAREN ANN

DISKIN, LARA NICOLE

Defendant Attorneys

SAUNDERS, JEFFREY J.

MARKARIAN, DAVID K

THAMES, RICHARD ROEMHELD

MONTIEL, LUIS ALFREDO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

12/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

9/26/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK ( V )

8/19/2019: INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

8/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

8/5/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

7/8/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

ORDER RESCHEDULING SALE ( V )

9/30/2020: ORDER RESCHEDULING SALE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE

8/17/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE

6/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE

MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE

6/4/2020: MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

4/27/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4387.1191 / 4678866) ( V )

2/25/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4387.1191 / 4678866) ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

2/25/2020: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

2/25/2020: CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL FORM

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

2/18/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS ( V )

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: FORECLOSURE SALE; Location: stlucie.clerkauction.com; Result: RESCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketFORECLOSURE SALE SET FOR 01/20/2021 AT 8:00 AM IN ONLINE/ , : FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESCHEDULING SALE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000065740; Applied Amount; $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020000065740 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113605850 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200921235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CANCEL SALE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DISKIN, LARA NICOLE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $7.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/08/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAREN ANN GREEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diskin, Lara, ESQ.