This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/26/2020 at 06:28:22 (UTC).

JOSUE, LINDA vs. RUPNOGOR INC

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 JOSUE, LINDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RUPNOGOR INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0296

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSUE, LINDA

Defendant

RUPNOGOR INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESSER, ROGER N

Defendant Attorneys

FREEMAN, NICHOLAS DAVID

HALDEMAN, MATTHEW NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

7/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

7/3/2019: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

6/18/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

6/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

5/21/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

5/21/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

5/7/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

2/26/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3/24/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

3/24/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4399.125 / 4690097)

3/20/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4399.125 / 4690097)

COURT NOTES

3/6/2020: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

12/24/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

NOTICE OF MEDIATION - AMENDED ( V )

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION - AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF MEDIATION ( V )

PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

12/13/2019: PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )

NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2020
  • DocketAttorney MATTHEW NICHOLAS HALDEMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2020
  • DocketAttorney ROGER N MESSER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2020
  • DocketAttorney NICHOLAS DAVID FREEMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4399.125 / 4690097)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: DOCKET CALL; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000012775; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MESSER, ROGER N - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000296, JOSUE, LINDA VS. RUPNOGOR INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/12/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MESSER, ROGER N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000012775 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84770105 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190212235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS FREEMAN