This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 13:27:49 (UTC).

JOSEPH, OSNER vs. MICHELE F LIBMAN MD PA

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 JOSEPH, OSNER filed an Other lawsuit against MICHELE F LIBMAN MD PA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BELANGER, ROBERT E and GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0332

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BELANGER, ROBERT E

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH, OSNER

Defendants

MICHELE F LIBMAN MD PA

HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

BEACHES OPEN MRI OF THE TREASURE COAST LLC

PSHS ALPHA PARTNERS LTD

B GREENWALD MEDICAL PA

JBG MEDICAL LLC

SURGICAL DEVICE EXCHANGE LLC

ANESTHESIOLOGY PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC

INTERVENTIONAL REHABILITATION OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC

SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN AND WELLNESS CENTER PA

ORCHID MEDI-CENTER LLC

NOVA ORTHO AND SPINE PLLC

BACK IN ACTION MEDICAL CENTER LLC

RAWLINGS FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

OASIS FINANCIAL GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PIKE, MICHAEL JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

AUSTIN, MICHAEL GARRETT

FLANAGAN, THOMAS E III

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

6/17/2022: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

ORDER OF RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION

6/15/2022: ORDER OF RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

6/13/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT

5/24/2022: DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

5/18/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL AND/OR DISQUALIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: PIKE, MICHAEL JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA000332, JOSEPH, OSNER VS. MICHELE F LIBMAN MD PA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 9 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-5/24/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $427.50 RECEIPT #2022000015004 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 144115924 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220223235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PIKE, MICHAEL JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/17/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA000332

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERVENTIONAL REHABILITATION OF SOUTH FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURGICAL DEVICE EXCHANGE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JBG Medical LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ORCHID MEDI-CENTER, LLC is a litigant