This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/14/2023 at 06:25:29 (UTC).

ANNITTO, GIANCARLO vs. BROWN, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 ANNITTO, GIANCARLO filed an Other lawsuit against BROWN, CHARLES. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BELANGER, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1030

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BELANGER, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNITTO, GIANCARLO

Defendants

BROWN, CHARLES

AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE - RECORDED (OTHER.4885.313. / 5093826)

9/7/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE - RECORDED (OTHER.4885.313. / 5093826)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

9/6/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/9/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE

9/6/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

8/26/2022: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

DEFAULT

8/11/2022: DEFAULT

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

8/11/2022: DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

8/11/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT

7/19/2022: DEFAULT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAttorney JOHN MARSHALL JORGENSEN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE - RECORDED (OTHER.4885.313. / 5093826)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT QUIETING TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JORGENSEN, JOHN MARSHALL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001030, JORGENSEN, JOHN MARSHALL VS. BROWN, CHARLES - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-8/11/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $429.00 RECEIPT #2022000044930 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 151171051 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220610235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: JORGENSEN, JOHN MARSHALL ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001030

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERIQUEST MORTGAGE COMPANY is a litigant