This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 02:59:08 (UTC).

JOHNSON, ANGELA RAE vs. JOHNSON, ISAAC JOEL

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 JOHNSON, ANGELA RAE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHNSON, ISAAC JOEL. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1447

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KLINGENSMITH, MARK WAYNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, ANGELA RAE

Respondent

JOHNSON, ISAAC JOEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/01/2012

DocketPRO-SE SHEET N/J:DOM GRANTED F/J SIGNED FRM NAME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2012

DocketFINAL JUDGMENT:F/J OF DOM (FN -- ANGELA RAE DUNCAN) SIGNED 10/31/12 (O/R 3450 PG 1722 ) REC'D 11/6/12 (CLOCKED IN 11/1/12)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2012

DocketDISPOSED BY NON-JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2012

DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING:OCTOBER 31, 2012 @ 3:30 PM F/H SIGNED 8/27/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2012

DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2012

DocketDEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketCASE JACKET TRACKING IN TEXT:CHECKED OUT 10/25/12 JDG KLINGENSMITH HRG 10/31/12 RET 10/31/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketPETITION DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE:DOM W/O CHILDREN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketMARITAL SETTLMENT AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketSTANDING TEMP DOMESTIC REL ODR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketAFFID OF DILIGENT SEARCH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2012

DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less