This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/21/2021 at 10:40:17 (UTC).

JESSE, MARIA vs. HARLEY QUEEN CANE CORSO

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 JESSE, MARIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARLEY QUEEN CANE CORSO. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3663

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSE, MARIA

Defendant

HARLEY QUEEN CANE CORSO

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

10/19/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL SERVED ( V )

10/19/2021: RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL SERVED ( V )

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ( V )

9/20/2021: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ( V )

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION

9/17/2021: NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/17/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ACKNOWLEDGMENT

9/17/2021: ACKNOWLEDGMENT

COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JESSE, MARIA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021SC003663, JESSE, MARIA VS. HARLEY QUEEN CANE CORSO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SRU-10/19/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000072748; Applied Amount; $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021000072748

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN K/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC003663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFILING CLAIM $500 - $2500 ASSESSED $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less