This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/10/2020 at 05:10:31 (UTC).

JB&B CAPITAL LLC vs. BACK FORTY INC

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 JB B CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BACK FORTY INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2381

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JB&B CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

CONNELY, JUSTINA H

BACK FORTY INC

HOPKINS, AMOS L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOVE, ROBERT ARNOLD

Defendant Attorney

MILDNER, ROY THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

2/21/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

2/21/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REPLY ( V )

2/18/2020: REPLY ( V )

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

2/10/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

1/22/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

12/12/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/12/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

4/6/2020: ORDER TO EXTEND TIME

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

2/21/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

2/21/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

1/17/2020: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

1/7/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

1/7/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

12/12/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SOLOVE, ROBERT ARNOLD ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/12/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002381

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2019000103420 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 100236538 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191212235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less