This case was last updated from St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 05:21:30 (UTC).

JAIMES, KATE vs. MULLIGANS ACQUISITION INC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 JAIMES, KATE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MULLIGANS ACQUISITION INC. This case was filed in St. Lucie County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1025

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIMES, KATE

Defendant

MULLIGANS ACQUISITION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REMER, JASON S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/8/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

6/8/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

6/8/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

6/9/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

6/30/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: REMER, JASON S - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CA001025, JAIMES, KATE VS. MULLIGANS ACQUISITION INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-6/9/2022"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022000044424 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 151116495 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220609235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/08/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CA001025

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Remer, Jason S