This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 08/10/2020 at 01:47:58 (UTC).

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC vs. AHERN, K

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against AHERN, K. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC

Defendant

AHERN, K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4393.250 / 4684468) ( V )

3/9/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4393.250 / 4684468) ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V )

3/6/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

2/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS ( V )

2/27/2020: MOTION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4387.615 / 4678674) ( V )

2/25/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4387.615 / 4678674) ( V )

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

2/21/2020: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V )

COURT NOTES

2/21/2020: COURT NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

1/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

1/17/2020: COMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/7/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/7/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2020
  • DocketAttorney RICHARD THOMAS PETITT - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4393.250 / 4684468) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: METZGER, ELIZABETH A; Location: Courtroom 3E - HC; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketREOPENED CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 03/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED FOR OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF PAYMENT RIGHTS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4387.615 / 4678674) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 02/21/2020 AT 10:55 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000002084; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/07/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020000002084 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 101213929 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200107235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less