Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/03/2020 at 15:07:27 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: WALKER, DOROTHY B

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 IN REGARDS TO WALKER, DOROTHY B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1293

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

WALKER, ORIS WILLIAM

Not Yet Classified

SAPP, GREGORY

WALKER, ORIS WILLIAM

SAPP, MARILYN BETHEL

SAPP, GLENN

SAPP, GARRETT

ZEIGLER, ANDREA SAPP

CANIDATE, JUDY SAPP

SAPP, FORREST

Decedent

WALKER, DOROTHY B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorneys

TILTON, LEE

CUNNINGHAM, MALLORYE GELITA

SCHULTZ, OWEN STUART

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4341.1004 / 4637042) ( V )

11/4/2019: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4341.1004 / 4637042) ( V )

DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

10/18/2019: DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

10/18/2019: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

OBJECTION TO INCOMPLETE ACCOUNTING FILED BY PR- AMENDED ( V )

10/12/2020: OBJECTION TO INCOMPLETE ACCOUNTING FILED BY PR- AMENDED ( V )

ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

10/1/2020: ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

EMERGENCY MOTION ( V )

8/10/2020: EMERGENCY MOTION ( V )

PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V )

7/13/2020: PETITION TO DISCHARGE ( V )

PROOF OF FORMAL NOTICE ( V )

6/24/2020: PROOF OF FORMAL NOTICE ( V )

STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS ( V )

6/15/2020: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS ( V )

NOTICE TO CREDITORS ( V )

6/15/2020: NOTICE TO CREDITORS ( V )

OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

6/12/2020: OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

6/12/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - RECORDED BOOK 4341 PAGE 1003

11/4/2019: ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - RECORDED BOOK 4341 PAGE 1003

AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4341.530 / 4636891) ( V )

11/1/2019: AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4341.530 / 4636891) ( V )

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

10/30/2019: WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

10/30/2019: OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V )

10/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4335.2991 / 4632042) ( V )

10/22/2019: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4335.2991 / 4632042) ( V )

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 11/18/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BRONIS, BARBARA W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROVING SUBPEONA DUCES TECUM FROM TALCOTT RESULTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO INCOMPLETE ACCOUNTING FILED BY PR- AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4335.2991 / 4632042) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019000087502 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 97490151 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191022235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CP001293

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TILTON, LEE