Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 03/23/2021 at 05:14:30 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: THOMPSON, CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 IN REGARDS TO THOMPSON, CHRISTINE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0091

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

BOGACKI, JANICE C

BOGACKI, CHARLES THOMAS 3

MAKE A WISH FOUNDATION

ROSS, RACHEL

ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL, C/O MS KATHERINE P MASON ESTATE COORDINATOR ESTATE DEPT

CATS AND DOGS FOREVER

TROWBRIDGE, REBECC

Decedent

THOMPSON, CHRISTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA

 

Court Documents

ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

2/8/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

2/8/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

1/22/2021: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4556.348 / 4818849) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4556.344 / 4818845) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4547.2729 / 4812466) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000006583; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4543.2036 / 4809165) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4543.1983 / 4809149) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021000006583 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 120088325 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210125235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/22/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CP000091

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA