This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/26/2021 at 13:27:35 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: REIL, LINA SOPHIE

Case Summary

On 12/18/2013 IN REGARDS TO REIL, LINA SOPHIE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1352

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HACKENJOS, WILLI

Claimants

PHARMERICA

ATLANTIC HEALTH CARE CENTER

RILES & WOOLLEY MONUMENTS

Not Yet Classified

KUCHLING, AXEL

HACKENJOS, JOHANNA

HACKENJOS, LINDA

HACKENJOS, MARION

KUEHLING, HEIDE

KUEHLING, CHRISTOF

KUEHLING, FRITZ

KUEHLING, HANNELORE

Decedent

REIL, LINA SOPHIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CONNELLY, STEPHEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney STEPHEN CONNELLY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.3842.650 / 4165360) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.3839.2928 / 4163190)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketWAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/18/2013 CASE NUMBER 2013CP001352

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMERICA is a litigant