Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 03/31/2021 at 05:18:01 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: PARKER, DAVID R

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 IN REGARDS TO PARKER, DAVID R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0133

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

PETRIE, TERESA M

BAIRD, RONNIE

ROBERTS, JOAN P

Not Yet Classified and Claimants

ROBERTS, JOAN P

LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, C/O PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC

Decedent

PARKER, DAVID R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4566.2766 / 4828179) ( V )

3/8/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4566.2766 / 4828179) ( V )

ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - Recorded (Other.4566.2765 / 4828178) ( V )

3/8/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - Recorded (Other.4566.2765 / 4828178) ( V )

OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4548.1195 / 4812941) ( V )

2/3/2021: OATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4548.1195 / 4812941) ( V )

WILL ON PROBATE ( V )

2/4/2021: WILL ON PROBATE ( V )

LAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

1/29/2021: LAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

1/29/2021: DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

1/29/2021: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4566.2766 / 4828179) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - Recorded (Other.4566.2765 / 4828178) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ROBERTS, JOAN P - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CP000133, IN REGARDS TO: PARKER, DAVID R - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: STCM-2/25/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CP000133, IN REGARDS TO: PARKER, DAVID R - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: STCM-2/25/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000015336; Applied Amount; $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: ROBERTS, JOAN P - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CP000133, IN REGARDS TO: PARKER, DAVID R - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: RECEIPT-2/25/2021,OWTW-2/24/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSMALL PHOTOGRAPHIC COPIES ASSESSED $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021000008545 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 120492220 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210201235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/29/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CP000133

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWNWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, C/O PROBATE RECOVERY SYSTEMS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA