This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/19/2023 at 18:37:30 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: MOOREHEAD, JESSE EDWARD

Case Summary

On 01/20/2005 IN REGARDS TO MOOREHEAD, JESSE EDWARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CONNER, BURTON C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CONNER, BURTON C

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

MOOREHEAD, LISA L

Decedent

MOOREHEAD, JESSE EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2019

DocketAttorney GEORGE GLENN - Deactivated by Automated Process

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2009

DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2009

DocketORD OF DISCHARGE:51] DATED: 3/20/09 BCC BK 3072 PG 2665

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2009

DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE:50] BK 3072 PG 2664 PG 2664

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2009

DocketMISCELLANEOUS LETTER:49] #1 LETTER TO: GEORGE GLENN ESQUIRE PAST DUE: ORDER OF DISCHARGE AND TAX RELEASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2009

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE:48] OF FORMAL NOTICE BY MAIL TO INTERESTED PARTIES BY: GEORGE GLENN, ESQUIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2009

DocketSATISFACTION OF CLAIMS:45] BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2009

DocketNOTICE OF FILING:44] SATISFACTION OF CLAIM FROM BELLSOUTH AND 2 COPIES OF CANCELLED CHECKS PAYABLE TO MBNA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2008

DocketNOTICE:43] AMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2008

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION:42] 4/15/08 THRU 7/15/08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
06/27/2005

DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION:13] 5-31-05 THRU 8-31-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2005

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOA:12] SANDY SHERMAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2005

DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION:10] BENEF LISA L MOOREHEAD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2005

DocketLETTER OF ADMINISTRATION:9] PR: LISA L MOOREHEAD DATED: 4-27-05 BCC BK 2257 PG 687

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2005

DocketBOND:8] 160,000.00 BK 2257 PG 685 - 686

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2005

DocketOATH OF PR DESGN RES AGNT:7] RES AGENT: GEROGE GLENN ESQUIRE BK 2155 PG 343

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2005

DocketORD APPT PERS REPRESENTATIVE:6] W/ BOND ( 160,000) DATED: 1-27-05 BCC BK 2155 PG 342

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2005

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE:5] FORMAL NOTICE TO CREDITOR TO: EDWARD W BECHT ESQUIRE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2005

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE:4] FORMAL NOTICE TO CAVEATOR TO: SUSAN DURDEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2005

DocketFORMAL NOTICE TO CAVEATOR:3] SUSAN DURDEN / EDWARD W. BECHT ESQ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less