This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 12:51:01 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: MOORE, CAROL JOAN

Case Summary

On 01/27/2014 IN REGARDS TO MOORE, CAROL JOAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

DALE, DANE

WOOD, JOHN C JR

THOMPSON, MATHEW

SUSKEY, TED

D'LAZZARO, COLLEEN

WOOD, JEFFREY S.

DALEY, DALE

LEISKE, HEIDI BROWN

ROYAL, TERRY

KRENGEL, HEATHER

WOOD, JEFFREY SCOTT II

PARKER, ROBIN

SUSKEY, WESLEY

MOORE, PATRICIA ANN

TIMMERMAN, MICHAEL

WHITEMEN, HAROLD

MOORE, MCKINLEY

MOORE, ROY S IV

WHITEMEN, CATHERINE

Decedent

MOORE, CAROL JOAN

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BROMBACHER, CAROLYN BETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney CAROLYN BETH BROMBACHER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2015
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • DocketPETITION TO DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.3715.1585 / 4038567)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE - Recorded (OR.3711.2860 / 4035144)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketPETITION TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF THE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF THE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND PORTIONS OF THE PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2014
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2014000009544; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE - Recorded (OR.3612.1824 / 3934489)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BROMBACHER, CAROLYN BETH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GEIGER, DWIGHT L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014CP000079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2014000009544 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 9515868 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20140127235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketOATH OF PR DESGN RES AGENT - Recorded (OR.3598.1543 / 3918707)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.3599.30 / 3919273)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brombacher, Carolyn B