This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/19/2023 at 12:08:33 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: MEMINGER, JAMES S

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 IN REGARDS TO MEMINGER, JAMES S was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARONICKI, BRETT M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0082

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARONICKI, BRETT M

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

MEMINGER, LOUISE

Decedent

MEMINGER, JAMES S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

WOOD, MARGARET ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

1/19/2023: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

WILL ON PROBATE

1/19/2023: WILL ON PROBATE

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4940.931. / 5145046)

1/19/2023: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4940.931. / 5145046)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE- RECORDED (OTHER. 4941.2437. /5146358)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketREQUEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - RECORDED (OTHER.4950.2026. / 5155009)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4950.2027. / 5155010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WOOD, MARGARET ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING CODICIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE WARONICKI, BRETT M: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: WOOD, MARGARET ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/19/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CP000082

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023000005009 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 165036587 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230119235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less