This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/25/2023 at 12:09:38 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: MEDAL, DOMONIC R

Case Summary

On 01/25/2023 IN REGARDS TO MEDAL, DOMONIC R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WARONICKI, BRETT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0109

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WARONICKI, BRETT M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NELSON, GINA

Decedent

MEDAL, DOMONIC R

 

Court Documents

DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

1/25/2023: DEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

1/25/2023: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

PAID FUNERAL BILL

1/25/2023: PAID FUNERAL BILL

PETITION TO DETER HOMESTEAD STATUS

1/25/2023: PETITION TO DETER HOMESTEAD STATUS

JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

1/25/2023: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

1/25/2023: AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2136. / 5147272)

1/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2136. / 5147272)

PETITION TO DETER HOMESTEAD STATUS - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2138. / 5147274)

1/26/2023: PETITION TO DETER HOMESTEAD STATUS - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2138. / 5147274)

PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2976. / 5147499)

1/26/2023: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4942.2976. / 5147499)

WILL ON PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4946.1140. / 5150606)

2/3/2023: WILL ON PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4946.1140. / 5150606)

ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1338. / 5158935)

2/24/2023: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1338. / 5158935)

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1352. / 5158942)

2/24/2023: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1352. / 5158942)

ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1356. / 5158945)

2/24/2023: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1356. / 5158945)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketAttorney MARGARET ELIZABETH WOOD - Deactivated by Automated Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1356. / 5158945)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1352. / 5158942)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD - RECORDED (OTHER.4954.1338. / 5158935)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE - RECORDED (OTHER.4946.1140. / 5150606)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE WARONICKI, BRETT M: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO DETER HOMESTEAD STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID FUNERAL BILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: WOOD, MARGARET ELIZABETH ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/25/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CP000109

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2023000006712 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 165445522 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230125235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less