This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 07:46:30 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: EMERSON, ROBERT L.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2014 IN REGARDS TO EMERSON, ROBERT L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0298

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Claimants

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY, LLC

FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY

FIA CARD SERVICES

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

FORD MOTOR CREDIT CO

PRESTON, ALLYSON

Not Yet Classified

CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY

LARMER, NICOLE

EMERSON, MICHAEL

EMERSON-LARMER, ANNE

EMERSON, MARJORIE

LARMER, MARY

EMERSON-LARMER, MATTHEW

LARMER, KRISTEN

Decedent

EMERSON, ROBERT L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

NEWMAN, ALICE B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney ALICE B NEWMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3930.2541 / 4246798) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - POA ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY - MARY LARMER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY - MARY LARMER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY - MARY LARMER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF DISCHARGE PETITION, AND RECEIPT BY BENEFICIARY - KRISTEN LARMER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketCERTIFYING COPIES ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GEIGER, DWIGHT L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/27/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014CP000298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $415.00 RECEIPT #2014000033013 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 11782094 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20140327235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketRENUNCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketOATH OF CORPORATE PERS REP - Recorded (OR.3616.297 / 3938269)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • DocketPETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORAL GABLES TRUST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Power & Light Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant