This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/23/2021 at 05:37:02 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: BLAIR, HENRIETTA M

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 IN REGARDS TO BLAIR, HENRIETTA M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1429

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK

Decedents

BERES, STEVEN D

BLAIR, HENRIETTA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

BERES, STEVEN D

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

9/29/2021: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4694.1969 / 4931244) ( V )

9/30/2021: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4694.1969 / 4931244) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRECPT OF BENEF CONSENT/DISCH ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBIT TO PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4704.2313 / 4939332) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000076223; Applied Amount; $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (Other.4694.1969 / 4931244) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $41.00 RECEIPT #2021000076506 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 135656300 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210930235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/29/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CP001429

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021000076223 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 135602453 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210929235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACOAST NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERES, STEVEN D