Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 04/15/2021 at 12:16:17 (UTC).

IN REGARDS TO: BAGALA, BRUNO F

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 IN REGARDS TO BAGALA, BRUNO F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Lucie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

LOJACONO, MICHAEL

Decedent

BAGALA, BRUNO F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

1/28/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

1/28/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

1/15/2021: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4548.41 / 4812543) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4548.38 / 4812541) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4545.2462 / 4810746) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketWILL ON PROBATE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4541.1759 / 4807338) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021000004738 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 119727171 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210119235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL & TESTAMENT-COPY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA TAX DUE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDISCLOSURE OF TRUST BENEFICIARIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CP000053

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, MELINDA MILKA