This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/22/2021 at 02:52:34 (UTC).

IANNALFO, FREDERICK C vs. JASTI, VENU

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 IANNALFO, FREDERICK C filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JASTI, VENU. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1414

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IANNALFO, FREDERICK C

Defendant

JASTI, VENU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLISON, ELISE SHERR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAttorney ELISE SHERR ALLISON - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000066182; Applied Amount; $42.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: ALLISON, ELISE SHERR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $42.00 RECEIPT #2020000066182 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 113710637 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200922235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS EXTENSION IN MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ACTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001414

    Read MoreRead Less