Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/14/2021 at 11:54:34 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA N A TR vs. UNK HEIRS OF EST OF WYCLIFFE JOHN JONES

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 HSBC BANK USA N A TR filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNK HEIRS OF EST OF WYCLIFFE JOHN JONES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1243

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA N A TR

Defendants

CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WYCLIFFE JOHN JONES

JONES, WYCLIFFE JOHN

CACH LLC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBBIE-ANN JONES-WATT

JONES-WATT, DEBBIE-ANN

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION II

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION I

UNK HEIRS OF EST OF WYCLIFFE JOHN JONES

JONES, CHARLES

HEWITT-JONES, YVONNE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHURCH, KELLEY L

MINA, PIERRE GEORGE

Defendant Attorneys

POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

BAGGETT, LEE JAMES

SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR

FISCHER, RANDALL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4465.1129 / 4745351)

8/24/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.4465.1129 / 4745351)

COMPLAINT

8/20/2020: COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

3/11/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

RETURN PLEADING FORM - RETURNING A CHECK TO DEBBIE-ANN JONES-WATT, BRONX, NY ADDRESS

11/24/2020: RETURN PLEADING FORM - RETURNING A CHECK TO DEBBIE-ANN JONES-WATT, BRONX, NY ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

11/3/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )

RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

10/30/2020: RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

10/29/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

10/14/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AMENDED - Recorded (Other.4487.2435 / 4763857)

10/7/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AMENDED - Recorded (Other.4487.2435 / 4763857)

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

9/30/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

9/9/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/9/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

9/9/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

8/20/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

8/20/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE AFFIR' DEFENSES OF D.JONES-WATT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE COUNTERCLAIM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000086545; Applied Amount; $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $900.00 RECEIPT #2020000086545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketFC CROSS CLAIM 50,001 - 250,000 ASSESSED $900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketFC CROSS CLAIM 50,000 OR LESS ASSESSED $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN PLEADING FORM - RETURNING A CHECK TO DEBBIE-ANN JONES-WATT, BRONX, NY ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001243

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF PORT ST LUCIE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ