This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 12/31/2020 at 20:56:57 (UTC).

HOOK, CAROL vs. OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

Case Summary

On 04/23/2012 HOOK, CAROL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CROOM, JANET C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1636

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CROOM, JANET C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOOK, CAROL

HOOK, MICHAEL

Defendants

OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD D/B/A COURTYARD BY MARRIOT HUTCH ISLAND

GRIFFITH, ED

OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WADE, RICHARD S

 

Court Documents

ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS

1/29/2015: ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

7/16/2014: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER ON MOTION TO DROP PARTY

1/8/2014: ORDER ON MOTION TO DROP PARTY

NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

12/12/2012: NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

9/27/2012: RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

PRIVILEGE LOG

9/27/2012: PRIVILEGE LOG

MOTION TO DISMISS:FOR IMPROPER VENUE

8/27/2012: MOTION TO DISMISS:FOR IMPROPER VENUE

SUMMONS RETURNED

5/29/2012: SUMMONS RETURNED

ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

5/22/2012: ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/1/2013: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/1/2013: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUBPOENA RETURNED

1/18/2013: SUBPOENA RETURNED

NTC OF TAKING VIDEO DEPO

12/12/2012: NTC OF TAKING VIDEO DEPO

ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

10/24/2012: ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO:

10/22/2012: NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO:

SUMMONS RETURNED

5/17/2012: SUMMONS RETURNED

NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::DEFT OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

4/23/2012: NTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::DEFT OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

COMPLAINT

4/23/2012: COMPLAINT

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney RICHARD S WADE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS - Recorded (OR.3712.979 / 4035480)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK REQUEST FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::DEFT ED GRIFFITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:DEFT ED GRIFFITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:DEFT OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::DEFT OPROCK JENSEN FEE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:DEFT OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketNTC OF SVC OF INTEROGS TO::DEFT OCEAN PROPERTIES LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADE, RICHARD S