This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/14/2023 at 02:54:22 (UTC).

HOME SFR BORROWER IV, LLC vs. MOORE, ASHON

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 HOME SFR BORROWER IV, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MOORE, ASHON. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2952

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOME SFR BORROWER IV, LLC

Defendants

MOORE, ASHON

MOORE, KIZZY CURTIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/9/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/9/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/9/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/9/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED - ASHON

11/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - ASHON

SUMMONS ISSUED - KIZZY

11/16/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - KIZZY

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - ASHON

11/29/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - ASHON

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - KIZZY

11/29/2022: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - KIZZY

CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE

11/30/2022: CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE

ANSWER - ASHON AND KIZZY MOORE

12/1/2022: ANSWER - ASHON AND KIZZY MOORE

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

12/5/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - RECORDED (OTHER.4922.2093. / 5128760)

12/5/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - RECORDED (OTHER.4922.2093. / 5128760)

WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

12/9/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

WRIT OF POSSESSION

12/9/2022: WRIT OF POSSESSION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION - RECORDED (OTHER.4922.2093. / 5128760)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - ASHON AND KIZZY MOORE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - KIZZY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - ASHON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CC002952, HOME SFR BORROWER IV, LLC VS. MOORE, ASHON - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-11/16/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022CC002952, HOME SFR BORROWER IV, LLC VS. MOORE, ASHON - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-11/16/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - KIZZY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ASHON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2022000087965 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 160994874 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20221116235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/14/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022CC002952

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME SFR BORROWER IV LLC is a litigant