This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/14/2021 at 12:33:30 (UTC).

HILTON, KATHLEEN vs. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 HILTON, KATHLEEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1582

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILTON, KATHLEEN

Defendants

MEIZINGER, KELLY

WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEATTIE, KELLY VERN

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, JACKELINE SOFIA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/13/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

1/5/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

12/31/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

12/31/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

11/20/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

11/20/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/20/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

11/18/2020: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

11/16/2020: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/5/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/29/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/19/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/19/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

10/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/19/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/19/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/19/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001582

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores East, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ, JACKELINE SOFIA