This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 01/27/2021 at 17:44:36 (UTC).

HILDALGO, RAFAEL vs. SANDROVICH, SHERRY M.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2014 HILDALGO, RAFAEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SANDROVICH, SHERRY M. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHWAB, CHARLES A, MCCANN, JAMES W, OLDEHOFF, JULIE and HEISEY, MICHAEL C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0285

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHWAB, CHARLES A

MCCANN, JAMES W

OLDEHOFF, JULIE

HEISEY, MICHAEL C

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILDALGO, RAFAEL

Respondent

SANDROVICH, SHERRY M.

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL/AGREED ( V )

5/2/2016: ORDER OF DISMISSAL/AGREED ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY/EMAILED SUPPORT 3/14/17 ( V )

3/14/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY/EMAILED SUPPORT 3/14/17 ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY/EMAILED SUPPORT 3/14/17 ( V ) - RECORDED (OTHER.3972.2512 / 4286660) ( V )

3/14/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY/EMAILED SUPPORT 3/14/17 ( V ) - RECORDED (OTHER.3972.2512 / 4286660) ( V )

MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ( V )

12/22/2017: MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY ( V )

MOTION FOR CHILD TO APPEAR IN COURT ( V )

12/22/2017: MOTION FOR CHILD TO APPEAR IN COURT ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

2/26/2018: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

EMERGENCY MOTION - EMAILED TO JUDGE SCHWAB & GALE 3-7-18 ( V )

3/7/2018: EMERGENCY MOTION - EMAILED TO JUDGE SCHWAB & GALE 3-7-18 ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

5/17/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

5/30/2018: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ( V )

FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

5/30/2018: FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000054053; Applied Amount; $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketDISCLOSURE ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITIONER/FATHERS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CUSTODY ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: MCCANN, JAMES W - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2014DR000285, HILDALGO, RAFAEL VS. SANDROVICH, SHERRY M. - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: ME-6/28/2019"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION ( V )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019000054053

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
181 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2014
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014000012611 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 9838890 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20140204235959.TXT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketSEALED SS# DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketPETITION PATERNTY SUPT MINOR CHILD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014DR000285

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less