This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/07/2021 at 15:26:38 (UTC).

HIGGINBOTTOM, MICHAEL vs. HILLMOOR PROFESSIONAL PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On 10/12/2020 HIGGINBOTTOM, MICHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HILLMOOR PROFESSIONAL PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRONIS, BARBARA W and BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1532

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRONIS, BARBARA W

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIGGINBOTTOM, MICHAEL

Defendants

HILLMOOR PROFESSIONAL PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOC., IN

HILLMOOR PROFESSIONAL PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOYNAZ, ANDY

Defendant Attorney

KOVEN, IAN

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

2/10/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

2/3/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

COURT NOTES

2/1/2021: COURT NOTES

RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

1/29/2021: RESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/22/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM ( V )

1/20/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING - ZOOM ( V )

MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

1/13/2021: MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

1/13/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

12/3/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

12/3/2020: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

12/2/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

11/13/2020: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

11/5/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/16/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

10/12/2020: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

10/12/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/12/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

10/12/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BUCHANAN, LAURIE E; Location: Video-Telephone-Remote; Result: CASE HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000072125; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LOYNAZ, ANDY ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA001532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020000072125 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114804138 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201012235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HILLMOOR PROFESSIONAL PLAZA CONDOMINIUM ASSOC., IN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOVEN, IAN