This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 02/11/2021 at 19:43:15 (UTC).

HEWETT, MARY E vs. VAZQUEZ MD PA, RAMON JR

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 HEWETT, MARY E filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VAZQUEZ MD PA, RAMON JR. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0373

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEWETT, ROBERT L

HEWETT, MARY E

Defendants

ORTHOFIX INC

NEURO IOM SERVICES LLC

PALM BEACH PATHOLOGY PA

IMAGING CENTER OF WEST PALM BEACH LLC

THE PALM BEACH GARDENS MEDICAL AUXILLARY INC

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF FLORIDA INC

UNITED HEALTHCARE INC

COLUMNA INC

PBG TEAM ANESTHESIA PA

GOOD SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER INC

VAZQUEZ MD PA, RAMON JR

TUCKAHOE DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC

PHYSICIAN SOLUTIONS LLC

GINAS PHYSICAL THERAPY INC

SHERIDAN HEALTHCORP INC

BEACHES MRI OF PSL LLC

ACCENT ON WELLNESS MIND BODY THERAPIES INC

FT PIERCE ORTHOPAEDICS LLC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN III

Defendant Attorneys

XENICK, DEAN THEODORE

MESSER, ROGER N

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V ) AMENDED

3/9/2020: COMPLAINT ( V ) AMENDED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

4/6/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ANSWER - RAMON VAZQUEZ JR

3/24/2020: ANSWER - RAMON VAZQUEZ JR

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/28/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000373, HEWETT, MARY E VS. FT PIERCE ORTHOPAEDICS LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-6/15/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN III - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2020CA000373, HEWETT, MARY E VS. FT PIERCE ORTHOPAEDICS LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-5/14/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketDEFAULTS - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/28/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020CA000373

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACHES MRI OF PSL, LLC AAO AQUILES HIDALGO is a litigant

Latest cases where ORTHOFIX INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PHYSICIAN'S SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Neuro IOM Services, LLC is a litigant