Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/18/2021 at 06:50:05 (UTC).

HEINLY, SAMANTHA JO vs. MACLEOD PROPERTIES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 HEINLY, SAMANTHA JO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MACLEOD PROPERTIES LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0026

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEINLY, SAMANTHA JO

Defendants

MACLEOD PROPERTIES LLC

KELLER, JOHN EDWARD

Minor

BREWSTER-FAULK, AYDEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN IV

Defendant Attorneys

COSBY, JEFFREY CHRISTOPHER

KRESLAVSKAYA, INNA

PITA, BRIAN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

7/7/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

7/1/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

7/1/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

6/30/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

6/30/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

6/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

6/30/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

6/30/2021: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

6/29/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/7/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/7/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

OTHER - INSURANCE INFORMATION DEMAND ( V )

1/7/2021: OTHER - INSURANCE INFORMATION DEMAND ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/7/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

1/7/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/7/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

1/7/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/7/2021: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

1/7/2021: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - AMENDED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER - INSURANCE INFORMATION DEMAND ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000026

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEBERARD, PHILIP EDWIN IV