This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 11/28/2022 at 06:12:38 (UTC).

HARRIS, SHANTE vs. NAPPER, MARCO

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 HARRIS, SHANTE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against NAPPER, MARCO. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCHUGH, ELIZABETH and GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2367

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARRIS, SHANTE

Respondent

NAPPER, MARCO

Not Yet Classified

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

CASTRO, HERNAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: DOR HEARING; Judge: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH; Location: Courtroom 2A - HC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDOR HEARING SET FOR 12/13/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 2A/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR002367, HARRIS, SHANTE VS. NAPPER, MARCO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/15/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2022DR002367, HARRIS, SHANTE VS. NAPPER, MARCO - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/15/2022"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET (CS-ES15)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CASTRO, HERNAN ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/15/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022DR002367

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNAN CASTRO