This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 01/03/2021 at 01:06:24 (UTC).

HANRAHAN, DANIEL vs. WALGREEN COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/13/2012 HANRAHAN, DANIEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALGREEN COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEIGER, DWIGHT L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2804

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEIGER, DWIGHT L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANRAHAN, DANIEL

Defendants

WALGREEN COMPANY

1ST CHOICE SERVICES, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACHTER, SETH

Defendant Attorneys

TARLOW, DAVID MICHAEL

COHEN, LEE M

 

Court Documents

RENOTICE TAKING DEPO

6/12/2013: RENOTICE TAKING DEPO

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

4/2/2013: SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

REQUEST FOR COPIES

4/1/2013: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

3/19/2013: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

3/1/2013: NTC SVG ANS TO INTEROGS

NTC OF TAKING DEPO

1/22/2013: NTC OF TAKING DEPO

MOTION TO COMPEL

12/5/2012: MOTION TO COMPEL

PLTF REPLY TO AFFIRM DEFENSES

10/22/2012: PLTF REPLY TO AFFIRM DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

8/16/2012: ANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

MOTION TO COMPEL

6/11/2013: MOTION TO COMPEL

MOTION FOR LEAVE

5/24/2013: MOTION FOR LEAVE

SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

4/2/2013: SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

RE-NTC OF TAKING DEPO

3/28/2013: RE-NTC OF TAKING DEPO

NTC OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

2/26/2013: NTC OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NTC OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/22/2013: NTC OF UNAVAILABILITY

PRIVILEGE LOG

10/10/2012: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

8/29/2012: NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

NTC OF PROP INTEROGS:WALGREEN CO

7/13/2012: NTC OF PROP INTEROGS:WALGREEN CO

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney SETH PACHTER - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney DAVID MICHAEL TARLOW - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE GEIGER, DWIGHT L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3555.2409 / 3872769)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRENOTICE TAKING DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRM DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2012321124044; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:1ST CHOICE SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketNTC OF PROP INTEROGS:1ST CHOICE SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE:WALGREEN CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNTC OF PROP INTEROGS:WALGREEN CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHTER ESQ, SETH W