This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2020 at 01:26:53 (UTC).

HANDAL, MARIANA vs. ASI ASSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 HANDAL, MARIANA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ASI ASSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1806

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANDAL, MARIANA

Defendant

ASI ASSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING

4/13/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

3/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT - SETTLEMENT ( V )

3/6/2020: MOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT - SETTLEMENT ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/18/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/18/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/18/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/18/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/18/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/18/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/18/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENFORCEMENT - SETTLEMENT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001806, HANDAL, MARIANA VS. ASI ASSURANCE CORP - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/18/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000077315; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DUBOFF, KENNETH ROBERT ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001806

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000077315 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 95878521 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190918235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less