This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 06:23:39 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs. REEVES, JOSHUA A

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against REEVES, JOSHUA A. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1562

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

REEVES, JOSHUA A

RUNYON, HEATHER L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

11/16/2017: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

7/12/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

7/31/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

7/12/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

9/28/2017: ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

8/23/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

8/23/2018: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA ( V )

9/28/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED JOSHUA ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

6/6/2018: RETURN MAIL ( V )

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney JEFFREY JOSEPH MOUCH - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • HearingEvent: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom K - SC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4176.1009 / 4476709) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/12/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC001562

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2017000053092 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 58892033 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170712235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION DOING BUSINESS AS GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY J MOUCH, ESQ