This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/04/2020 at 05:03:20 (UTC).

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY vs. RR TREASURE COAST LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against RR TREASURE COAST LLC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2350

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ST. LOUIS, SAMUEL DERLIN

MORANCY, YVES

RR TREASURE COAST LLC

ST LOUIS, DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLICK, LEVI

KAMMER, RONALD L

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT - 2 PARTIES

3/20/2020: DEFAULT - 2 PARTIES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

3/20/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

2/10/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

2/10/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

2/7/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

1/13/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

1/13/2020: MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

12/6/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

12/6/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

3/19/2020: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

2/11/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED - DANIEL ST LOUIS ( V )

2/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED - DANIEL ST LOUIS ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

2/7/2020: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

1/13/2020: DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

1/13/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )

ANSWER RR TREASURE COAST LLC ( V )

1/3/2020: ANSWER RR TREASURE COAST LLC ( V )

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: GLICK, LEVI; KAMMER, RONALD L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA002350, GRANADA INSURANCE COMPANY VS. RR TREASURE COAST LLC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: DEF-3/20/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - 2 PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE METZGER, ELIZABETH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KAMMER, RONALD L ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2019000102045 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 99921757 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20191209235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/06/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA002350

    Read MoreRead Less