This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/08/2021 at 04:02:56 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, HUMBERTO vs. BIG JOHNSON CONCRETE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 GONZALEZ, HUMBERTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BIG JOHNSON CONCRETE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BUCHANAN, LAURIE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0360

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BUCHANAN, LAURIE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, HUMBERTO

Defendants

FRENZE, COLBY EDWARD

BIG JOHNSON CONCRETE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCREMIN, ANTHONY JAMES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

2/26/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

2/25/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

2/25/2021: ALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

2/25/2021: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

2/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SCREMIN, ANTHONY JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000360, GONZALEZ, HUMBERTO VS. BIG JOHNSON CONCRETE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/26/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2021000016250; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SCREMIN, ANTHONY JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2021CA000360, GONZALEZ, HUMBERTO VS. BIG JOHNSON CONCRETE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/26/2021"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BUCHANAN, LAURIE E: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/26/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CA000360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021000016250 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 122114870 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210226235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS OR PLURIES SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scremin, Anthony J.