This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 18:01:35 (UTC).

GMCB LLC vs. SELENT, DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 GMCB LLC filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against SELENT, DAVID. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0200

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GMCB LLC

Defendants

SELENT, GWEENDALYN LACHICA

SELENT, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REGAN, JAMES

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

2/27/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

6/3/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

6/3/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

2/25/2019: ANSWER ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/12/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

1/31/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/29/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/29/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/29/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/29/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000008986; Applied Amount; $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: REGAN, JAMES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000200, GMCB LLC VS. SELENT, DAVID - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/31/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: REGAN, JAMES ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2019000008986 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 84065332 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190131235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/30/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGAN, JAMES