This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/10/2020 at 19:13:19 (UTC).

FRIEDMAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS 1, LLC vs. COSTA LEITE, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 FRIEDMAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS 1, LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against COSTA LEITE, RICHARD. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2434

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRIEDMAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS 1, LLC

Defendants

LEITE, TAMMY MARIE

COSTA LEITE, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPOLIANSKY, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

11/29/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

WRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

11/17/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4059.1590 / 4366079) ( V )

11/1/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4059.1590 / 4366079) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

10/31/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

10/27/2017: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/24/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

10/24/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

10/23/2017: CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE- PROPOSED ( V )

10/23/2017: CERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE- PROPOSED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/19/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

10/19/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/18/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

10/18/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney MICHAEL SPOLIANSKY - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4059.1590 / 4366079) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF MAILING/SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SPOLIANSKY, MICHAEL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CC002434, FRIEDMAN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS 1, LLC VS. COSTA LEITE, RICHARD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/19/2017"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SPOLIANSKY, MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 10/18/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC002434

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017000076845 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 63008122 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20171018235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPOLIANSKY, MICHAEL