This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/29/2020 at 09:12:37 (UTC).

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC vs. UNK HEIRS BENEFICIARIES EST OF SHIRLEY J HOWELL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNK HEIRS BENEFICIARIES EST OF SHIRLEY J HOWELL. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1015

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY

HIGH POINT OF FORT PIERCE CONDOMINIUM SECTION II ASSOCIATION INC

REDMON, KATHY

EVANS, CINDY

UNK HEIRS BENEFICIARIES EST OF SHIRLEY J HOWELL

EVANS, CYNTHIA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

SHEPHERD, SHARON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHIRLEY J HOWELL A/K/A SHIRLEY JUANITA HOWELL

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORCE, STEVEN L

Defendant Attorney

ENSOR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL ( V )

9/19/2019: NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

9/17/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

6/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

6/28/2019: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

5/21/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

5/16/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

5/16/2019: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

5/16/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

5/16/2019: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/21/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

RETURN MAIL ( V )

2/19/2020: RETURN MAIL ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

2/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE ( V )

1/23/2020: MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE ( V )

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

1/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE - PROPOSED ( V )

NOTICE OF SALE ( V )

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF SALE ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4357.1472 / 4651595) ( V )

12/11/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4357.1472 / 4651595) ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )

12/10/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ( V )

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ( V )

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN MAIL ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4381.712 / 4673158) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001015, FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC VS. UNK HEIRS BENEFICIARIES EST OF SHIRLEY J HOWELL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CEOT-2/11/2020,CND-2/10/2020"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2020000009133; Applied Amount; $290.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAttorney STEVEN L FORCE - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE MIRMAN, LAWRENCE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ASSESSED $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS CIR CIV ASSESSED $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMF 50,001<250,000 ASSESSED $905.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5 CIR CIV ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/16/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Force, Steven L