This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 07/09/2020 at 05:15:55 (UTC).

FBC MORTGAGE LLC vs. SCOTT, TIMOTHY LEE

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 FBC MORTGAGE LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SCOTT, TIMOTHY LEE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0147

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FBC MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

SCOTT, KRISTI-LYN

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

RIVER PLACE ON THE SAINT LUCIE OWNERS ASSOCIATION

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

SCOTT, TIMOTHY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEE

SMITH, ANTHONY RYAN

Defendant Attorney

ENSOR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

REPLY

3/20/2020: REPLY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

3/20/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3/17/2020: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/17/2020: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

3/5/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

2/21/2020: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

2/20/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

2/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

2/20/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

1/25/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

1/25/2020: VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

LIS PENDENS ( V )

1/25/2020: LIS PENDENS ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/25/2020: COMPLAINT ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

1/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $1960.00 RECEIPT #2020000008363 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 102223576 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20200127235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less