This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 10/25/2020 at 12:00:33 (UTC).

FABIAN, EMMA vs. HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 FABIAN, EMMA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

COMERICA BANK AND TRUST NA GRDN

FABIAN, MICHAEL

SPENCE, JUNE

FABIAN, EMMA

Defendant

HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

SOMERA, PETER J.

RICHARDSON, ADAM J

ROCKENBACH, BARD DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

RITUCCI, AMANDA

GOLDSTEIN, JACLYN A

D'LUGO, MICHAEL ROSS

 

Court Documents

WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT

6/4/2020: WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANT

WITNESS LIST - PLTF

5/18/2020: WITNESS LIST - PLTF

WITNESS LIST AMENDED - PLAINTIFF ( V )

1/30/2020: WITNESS LIST AMENDED - PLAINTIFF ( V )

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

12/24/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

8/20/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS ( V )

8/8/2019: ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS ( V )

COURT NOTES

8/7/2019: COURT NOTES

MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

7/19/2019: MOTION TO COMPEL ( V )

RESPONSE ( V )

7/17/2019: RESPONSE ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

1/24/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO MOTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Judge: BRONIS, BARBARA W; Location: Courtroom 3D - HC; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
443 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000007008; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SOMERA, PETER J. - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA000152, FABIAN, MICHAEL VS. HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-1/24/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SOMERA, PETER J. ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/24/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA000152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000007008 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 83846835 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190124235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Comerica Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bard D Rockenbach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Somera, Peter J, Jr.