This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/05/2020 at 17:46:56 (UTC).

EMILE, JAMES vs. BELIZAIRE, IRLANDE

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 EMILE, JAMES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BELIZAIRE, IRLANDE. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0770

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EMILE, YVON

EMILE, JAMES

Defendant

BELIZAIRE, IRLANDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

3/29/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

EVICTION SUMMONS

4/4/2017: EVICTION SUMMONS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

5/15/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

5/15/2017: MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

5/16/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

5/19/2017: ANSWER ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

5/19/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

5/22/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3999.981 / 4311497) ( V )

5/23/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3999.981 / 4311497) ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney DAVID GEORGE SIMMONS JR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketAttorney DAVID GEORGE SIMMONS JR - Deactivated by Automated Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3999.981 / 4311497) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR; TOPEL, ADAM MATTHEW - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CC000770, EMILE, JAMES VS. BELIZAIRE, IRLANDE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MDCD-5/16/2017"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2017CC000770, EMILE, JAMES VS. BELIZAIRE, IRLANDE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MDCD-5/16/2017"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $7.00 RECEIPT #2017000026611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketMISC CLERK FEES ASSESSED $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT ATTORNEY: SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND WARREN III: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/04/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC000770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017000026728 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 54388595 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170404235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketEXHIBIT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMONS, DAVID GEORGE JR