This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County on 04/20/2020 at 21:17:21 (UTC).

EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM CORP vs. SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRONIS, BARBARA W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1869

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - St. Lucie County

  • Courthouse:

    St. Lucie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRONIS, BARBARA W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM CORP

Defendant

SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOWZAN, JULIA M ESQ

Defendant Attorney

COTUGNO, JENNIFER DIANE

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

11/15/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

10/21/2019: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

10/1/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

9/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

COMPLAINT ( V )

9/27/2019: COMPLAINT ( V )

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

9/27/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

9/27/2019: NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

9/27/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

9/27/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

9/27/2019: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

9/27/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2019000080145; Applied Amount; $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docket"RECIPIENTS: KOWZAN, JULIA M ESQ - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT 2019CA001869, EMERGENCY RESPONSE TEAM CORP VS. SAFEPOINT INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-9/27/2019"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: KOWZAN, JULIA M ESQ ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/27/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019CA001869

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2019000080145 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 96422314 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190927235959.TXT.

    Read MoreRead Less