This case was last updated from St. Lucie County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 04:06:35 (UTC).

ELOIZIN, JEAN vs. GAY, LATOYA MARCIA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 ELOIZIN, JEAN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GAY, LATOYA MARCIA. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Courts, St. Lucie County Courthouse located in St. Lucie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALONZO, EDMOND W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1533

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    St. Lucie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALONZO, EDMOND W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELOIZIN, JEAN

Defendant

GAY, LATOYA MARCIA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT ( V )

7/10/2017: COMPLAINT ( V )

EVICTION SUMMONS

7/10/2017: EVICTION SUMMONS

EVICTION SUMMONS

7/10/2017: EVICTION SUMMONS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

7/12/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

ANSWER ( V )

7/18/2017: ANSWER ( V )

ORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

7/20/2017: ORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

7/26/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4024.576 / 4334544) ( V )

7/26/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4024.576 / 4334544) ( V )

WRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

7/31/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

8/8/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • HearingEvent: EVICTION HEARING; Judge: ALONZO, EDMOND W; Location: Courtroom L - SC; Result: DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4024.576 / 4334544) ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketEVICTION HEARING SET FOR 07/26/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ALONZO, EDMOND W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialReceipt #: 2017000052297; Applied Amount; $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017000052297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ( V )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketEACH DEFT OVER 5-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketTENANT EVICTION ASSESSED $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS-CNTY CIVIL ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/10/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017CC001533

    Read MoreRead Less